NY S01642 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enables the state dormitory authority to construct and finance dormitories and related facilities for the St. Andrew's Foundation, the Scottish Society of Hudson's Valley, Ltd.
Title
Enables the state dormitory authority to construct and finance dormitories and related facilities for the St. Andrew's Foundation, the Scottish Society of Hudson's Valley, Ltd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.299 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.378 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a5505 |
2012-05-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2012-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.607 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-06-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1494 |
2011-06-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05505 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s1642