NY S01633 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 1633A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 1633A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to amount of apportionments and deficiencies in apportionments of state monies to certain nonpublic schools to reimburse them for their expenses in complying with certain state requirements.
Title
Relates to amount of apportionments and deficiencies in apportionments of state monies to certain nonpublic schools to reimburse them for their expenses in complying with certain state requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1633A |
2018-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01322 (Same As) 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken