NY S01626 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Sets a state-wide three percent cap on penalties for unpaid real property tax due and payable or remaining unpaid during the period from March 7, 2020 to June 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sets a state-wide three percent cap on penalties for unpaid real property tax due and payable or remaining unpaid during the period from March 7, 2020 to June 30, 2021.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2023-01-13SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback