NY S01618 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the penalty for sexual abuse in the 2nd degree from a class A misdemeanor to a class E felony.
Title
Raises the penalty for sexual abuse in the 2nd degree from a class A misdemeanor to a class E felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.59 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-03-31 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.174 |
2011-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |