NY S01616 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.483
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.483
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the metropolitan transportation authority to create an expired fare transfer policy.
Title
Requires the metropolitan transportation authority to create an expired fare transfer policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.483 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.667 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a2512 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1400 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1616A |
2017-02-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02512 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s1616a