NY S01611 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3475A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to horsemen's health, welfare, pension and administrative benefits for harness racing licensees in the absence of contractual obligations; requires that in the absence of a contract between the licensed harness racing corporation or association and the representative horsemen's organization, the state gaming commission shall as a condition of racing require an association or corporation to withhold and pay eight percent of all unpaid and existing monies and to pay such sum to the horsemen's organization quarterly at facilities located in Westchester and Nassau county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to horsemen's health, welfare, pension and administrative benefits for harness racing licensees in the absence of contractual obligations; requires that in the absence of a contract between the licensed harness racing corporation or association and the representative horsemen's organization, the state gaming commission shall as a condition of racing require an association or corporation to withhold and pay eight percent of all unpaid and existing monies and to pay such sum to the horsemen's organization quarterly at facilities located in Westchester and Nassau county.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A3475A
2024-05-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1126
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
2023-05-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 1611A
2023-05-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
2023-01-13SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING

Same As/Similar To

A03475 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback