NY S01610 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the towing protection enforcement act; updates laws that regulate the towing of vehicles, including adding provisions thereto to prevent predatory towing of vehicles within the City of New York.
Title
Enacts the towing protection enforcement act; updates laws that regulate the towing of vehicles, including adding provisions thereto to prevent predatory towing of vehicles within the City of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.271 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A03380 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to cities