NY S01608 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - VETOED MEMO.93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - VETOED MEMO.93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the appointment and promotion of certain personnel of the sanitation department of the city of New York; authorizes the promotion of personnel to the positions of General Superintendent 2 and General Superintendent 3.
Title
Relates to the appointment and promotion of certain personnel of the sanitation department of the city of New York; authorizes the promotion of personnel to the positions of General Superintendent 2 and General Superintendent 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.93 |
2022-12-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.602 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a4006 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1632 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04006 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s1608