NY S01579 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a plaintiff including a lender, an assignee or a mortgage loan servicer in a mortgage foreclosure action to maintain the subject property.
Title
Requires a plaintiff including a lender, an assignee or a mortgage loan servicer in a mortgage foreclosure action to maintain the subject property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.78 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.692 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.195 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a5923a |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-03-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1579A |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.197 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05923 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - substituted by s1579a