NY S01567 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the state board of elections to publish the campaign website addresses of candidates for governor, lieutenant governor, attorney general, state comptroller, member of the state senate and member of the state assembly; directs such candidates to provide their campaign website addresses to the state board of elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the state board of elections to publish the campaign website addresses of candidates for governor, lieutenant governor, attorney general, state comptroller, member of the state senate and member of the state assembly; directs such candidates to provide their campaign website addresses to the state board of elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.307
2017-09-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading cal.226
2017-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a5740a
2017-05-22Assemblyreferred to election law
2017-05-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-09SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1567A
2017-03-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-03-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.314
2017-01-10SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05740 (Same As) 2017-06-06 - substituted by s1567a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback