NY S01546 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that one of the members of the board of standards and appeals be a financial analyst with professional qualifications and at least ten years experience as a financial analyst.
Title
Requires that one of the members of the board of standards and appeals be a financial analyst with professional qualifications and at least ten years experience as a financial analyst.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.481 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01355 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to cities