NY S01546 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes an attorney to attach a lien to awards and settlement proceeds received by his or her client through alternative dispute resolution or settlement negotiations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes an attorney to attach a lien to awards and settlement proceeds received by his or her client through alternative dispute resolution or settlement negotiations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.478
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.151
2012-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a5275
2012-04-30Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2012-04-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-03-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-03-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-03-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.390
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2011-01-10SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05275 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s1546

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback