NY S01543 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for theft of a motor vehicle when a child under 16 is in or on such vehicle.
Title
Increases penalties for theft of a motor vehicle when a child under 16 is in or on such vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Skelos [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.339 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.306 |
2011-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |