NY S01542 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary task force on black market cigarettes to examine and investigate such issues related to sale and distribution in New York of tobacco products for which required tax has not been paid, including, but not limited to, unlawfully manufactured cigarettes, cigarettes smuggled from low-tax jurisdictions, and stolen tobacco products from convenience stores, cargos and truck hijacking; provides such task force shall consist of nine members.
Title
Establishes a temporary task force on black market cigarettes to examine and investigate such issues related to sale and distribution in New York of tobacco products for which required tax has not been paid, including, but not limited to, unlawfully manufactured cigarettes, cigarettes smuggled from low-tax jurisdictions, and stolen tobacco products from convenience stores, cargos and truck hijacking; provides such task force shall consist of nine members.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1925 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1542A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00390 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental operations