NY S01519 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires optometrists to meet certain standards, including the completion of a course, to prescribe oral medications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires optometrists to meet certain standards, including the completion of a course, to prescribe oral medications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04Assemblyreferred to higher education
2021-03-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-01-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-01-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-01-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.95
2021-01-12SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A01921 (Same As) 2021-01-13 - referred to higher education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback