NY S01512 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the number of senators and the apportionment of senate districts; provides that each senate district shall be comprised of one county in its entirety.
Title
Relates to the number of senators and the apportionment of senate districts; provides that each senate district shall be comprised of one county in its entirety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-04 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-02-23 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2023-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |