NY S01505 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 1505B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Lois J. Reid to reapply for ordinary disability retirement benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Lois J. Reid to reapply for ordinary disability retirement benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 1505B
2024-01-05SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2023-01-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 1505A
2023-01-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2023-01-12SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback