NY S01505 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1505A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that restaurants only provide single-use plastic straws to customers when explicitly requested by the customer; prohibits single-use plastic stirrers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that restaurants only provide single-use plastic straws to customers when explicitly requested by the customer; prohibits single-use plastic stirrers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 1505A
2022-03-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2021-01-12SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A00207 (Same As) 2022-02-17 - advanced to third reading cal.417

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback