NY S01499 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to suspending the granting of charters for proposed charter schools not acted upon prior to April 1, 2021; provides that no further action shall be taken for charter schools where classes have not commenced prior to August 31, 2021.
Title
Relates to suspending the granting of charters for proposed charter schools not acted upon prior to April 1, 2021; provides that no further action shall be taken for charter schools where classes have not commenced prior to August 31, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |