NY S01488 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the provision of criminal history background checks free of charge to mentoring programs operated by not-for-profit corporations.
Title
Relates to the provision of criminal history background checks free of charge to mentoring programs operated by not-for-profit corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2022-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.426 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1127 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04481 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - reported referred to ways and means