NY S01481 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.361
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.361
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the duties of the office of children and family services concerning lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender runaway and homeless youth.
Title
Expands the duties of the office of children and family services concerning lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender runaway and homeless youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Senate | signed chap.361 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.134 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1481A |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.402 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | print number 3619a |
2019-05-14 | Senate | amend and recommit to children and families |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3619A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1481A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.134 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03619 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - signed chap.361