NY S01479 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the New York city department of buildings to confirm that there are no tenants living at certain properties prior to approving or issuing permits for the demolition or the substantial alteration or renovation of such properties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the New York city department of buildings to confirm that there are no tenants living at certain properties prior to approving or issuing permits for the demolition or the substantial alteration or renovation of such properties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.155
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback