NY S01478 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mortgage guaranty insurance; removes requirement that mortgage guaranty insurers restrict their coverage, net of applicable reinsurance, to twenty-five percent of the total indebtedness to an insured.
Title
Relates to mortgage guaranty insurance; removes requirement that mortgage guaranty insurers restrict their coverage, net of applicable reinsurance, to twenty-five percent of the total indebtedness to an insured.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.373 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.208 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | substituted for a1953 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.673 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01953 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - substituted by s1478