NY S01477 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes contacts via text, email, private message, direct message or other electronic communication in the definition of the offense of aggravated harassment in the second degree.
Title
Includes contacts via text, email, private message, direct message or other electronic communication in the definition of the offense of aggravated harassment in the second degree.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-02-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.368 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1477A |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.174 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00544 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to codes