NY S01476 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning lending practices by financial institutions to landlords acquiring property that includes small business and/or rent-regulated tenants; requires a report on the department's findings and recommendations for legislative action within eighteen months.
Title
Directs the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning lending practices by financial institutions to landlords acquiring property that includes small business and/or rent-regulated tenants; requires a report on the department's findings and recommendations for legislative action within eighteen months.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.55 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.351 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.875 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1476B |
2020-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.133 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.252 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | rules report cal.252 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-07 | Senate | amend and recommit to rules 3275b |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Senate | print number 3275a |
2019-05-30 | Senate | amend and recommit to banks |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to banks |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3275B |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.875 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1476B |
2019-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2019-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1476A |
2019-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A03275 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.55