NY S01469 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to extending the exemption from filing requirements only with respect to rates and policy forms to businesses underwritten and transacted from an office outside this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to extending the exemption from filing requirements only with respect to rates and policy forms to businesses underwritten and transacted from an office outside this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-06Assemblyreferred to insurance
2024-05-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-04-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-04-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-04-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.797
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-15Assemblyreferred to insurance
2023-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-04-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-04-25Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-04-24Senate1ST REPORT CAL.629
2023-01-12SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A08212 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - reported referred to rules

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback