NY S01465 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.398
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.398
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that every banking institution which maintains checking accounts for customers shall pay checks in the order received within account balance; provides such banks may dishonor check for insufficient funds, but then must honor smaller checks within amounts on deposit in the subject account.
Title
Provides that every banking institution which maintains checking accounts for customers shall pay checks in the order received within account balance; provides such banks may dishonor check for insufficient funds, but then must honor smaller checks within amounts on deposit in the subject account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-19 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.398 |
2021-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.163 |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | substituted for a1073 |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.432 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A01073 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - substituted by s1465