NY S01442 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to additional equipment requirements for stretch limousines; requires that stretch limousines are equipped with the necessary quantity of window break tools and operational fire extinguishers.
Title
Relates to additional equipment requirements for stretch limousines; requires that stretch limousines are equipped with the necessary quantity of window break tools and operational fire extinguishers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Scarcella-Spanton [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Monica Martinez [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.316 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-01-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.145 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06513 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to transportation