NY S01418 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO LIBRARIES
Pending: Senate Libraries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to conducting a study on the access of state public libraries and library systems to capital funding; the department of education, in consultation with the dormitory authority, the office of the state comptroller, and the public library systems of the state, shall assess and report on the capital needs of such public library systems, including public libraries and association libraries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to conducting a study on the access of state public libraries and library systems to capital funding; the department of education, in consultation with the dormitory authority, the office of the state comptroller, and the public library systems of the state, shall assess and report on the capital needs of such public library systems, including public libraries and association libraries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Libraries Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LIBRARIES
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-01Assemblyreferred to libraries and education technology
2023-06-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1208
2023-01-11SenateREFERRED TO LIBRARIES

Same As/Similar To

A07965 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to libraries and education technology

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback