NY S01411 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Passed on October 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-22 - SIGNED CHAP.334
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Passed on October 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-22 - SIGNED CHAP.334
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the New York state volunteer firefighter gap coverage cancer disability benefits act.
Title
Relates to the New York state volunteer firefighter gap coverage cancer disability benefits act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.334 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.465 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a711b |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1411B |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1411A |
2017-06-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.40 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00711 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s1411b