NY S01398 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - PRINT NUMBER 1398A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - PRINT NUMBER 1398A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes in the city of New York a bicycle lane safety program to enforce certain restrictions on the use of protected bicycle lanes by means of bicycle lane photo devices.
Title
Establishes in the city of New York a bicycle lane safety program to enforce certain restrictions on the use of protected bicycle lanes by means of bicycle lane photo devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1398A |
2022-05-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10446 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - referred to transportation