NY S01397 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any solicitation on behalf of a charitable organization shall include a statement clearly stating what percentage of the charity's proceeds are applied to such charity's stated mission.
Title
Provides that any solicitation on behalf of a charitable organization shall include a statement clearly stating what percentage of the charity's proceeds are applied to such charity's stated mission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.852 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.457 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |