NY S01394 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the port authority shall prohibit nonstop flights to or from points beyond one thousand five hundred miles, except on Saturdays and flights to Denver, Colorado, from flying to or from LaGuardia airport, an air terminal of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.
Title
Provides that the port authority shall prohibit nonstop flights to or from points beyond one thousand five hundred miles, except on Saturdays and flights to Denver, Colorado, from flying to or from LaGuardia airport, an air terminal of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2024-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.951 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.449 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00912 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions