NY S01380 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A129A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A129A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.
Title
Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A129A |
2022-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1495 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1380A |
2022-03-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00129 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - approval memo.52