NY S01370 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a fine of not less than ten thousand dollars for each offense committed, or by imprisonment for not more than one hundred eighty days or by both such fine and imprisonment for a class A misdemeanor where a stretch limousine has failed an inspection but an operator still operates such vehicle; provides for the seizure and redemption of unlawfully operated and unsafe commercial motor vehicles by an officer; requires such vehicle information to be entered into the New York statewide police information network as an impounded vehicle; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides for a fine of not less than ten thousand dollars for each offense committed, or by imprisonment for not more than one hundred eighty days or by both such fine and imprisonment for a class A misdemeanor where a stretch limousine has failed an inspection but an operator still operates such vehicle; provides for the seizure and redemption of unlawfully operated and unsafe commercial motor vehicles by an officer; requires such vehicle information to be entered into the New York statewide police information network as an impounded vehicle; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2024-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.314 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-01-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | AMENDED 1370A |
2023-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.143 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |