NY S01366 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the department of transportation to issue seasonal agricultural permits for oversize vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows the department of transportation to issue seasonal agricultural permits for oversize vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.233
2019-01-14SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A03700 (Same As) 2019-01-30 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback