NY S01365 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the forest ranger force to establish a training program for volunteer search and rescue personnel to assist the forest rangers in wild, remote and forested areas of the state.
Title
Authorizes the forest ranger force to establish a training program for volunteer search and rescue personnel to assist the forest rangers in wild, remote and forested areas of the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-01-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.37 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2013-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.114 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07010 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation