NY S01358 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates South Park Avenue in or near Lackawanna as a state highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates South Park Avenue in or near Lackawanna as a state highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-06SenateRECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
2024-01-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2023-04-25SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-01-11SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback