NY S01355 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reporting of alienation of municipal parkland.
Title
Relates to the reporting of alienation of municipal parkland.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.613 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.181 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08083 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to local governments