NY S01355 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting Jacobe's Law in relation to requiring school administrators to contact the parents or guardians of students when bullying or harassment has occurred.
Title
Relates to enacting Jacobe's Law in relation to requiring school administrators to contact the parents or guardians of students when bullying or harassment has occurred.
Sponsors
Sen. James Tedisco [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.534 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1695 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1355B |
2017-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1355A |
2017-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08114 (Same As) 2018-06-15 - print number 8114e