NY S01350 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the deposit, into the dedicated highway and bridge trust fund, of a portion of the sales tax collected on each gallon of motor fuel sold at retail.
Title
Requires the deposit, into the dedicated highway and bridge trust fund, of a portion of the sales tax collected on each gallon of motor fuel sold at retail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08876 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means