NY S01345 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2896
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to critical energy infrastructure security and responsibility and provides for the protection of critical infrastructure in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to critical energy infrastructure security and responsibility and provides for the protection of critical infrastructure in the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A2896
2023-01-17SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.113
2023-01-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A02896 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.67

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback