NY S01345 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for notification to the state when a foster home is decertified, not renewed or a child is removed; requires evaluation to determine if certificate should be issued and the home be re-opened.
Title
Provides for notification to the state when a foster home is decertified, not renewed or a child is removed; requires evaluation to determine if certificate should be issued and the home be re-opened.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Daniel Squadron [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1345A |
2012-06-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2012-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.617 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2011-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10143 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES