NY S01343 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the acquisition of real property by eminent domain and the methods for calculating compensation for such acquisition.
Title
Relates to the acquisition of real property by eminent domain and the methods for calculating compensation for such acquisition.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1343B |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.443 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1343A |
2021-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03565 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to local governments