NY S01339 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Dedicates and designates Jerome Park as parklands of the city of New York and establishes a working group for such park to enhance the use thereof.
Title
Dedicates and designates Jerome Park as parklands of the city of New York and establishes a working group for such park to enhance the use thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.612 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1339A |
2016-03-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.140 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00301 (Same As) 2016-03-03 - print number 301a