NY S01336 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - SIGNED CHAP.97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes technical corrections to the Lorena Borjas transgender and non-binary (TGNB) wellness and equity program fund act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes technical corrections to the Lorena Borjas transgender and non-binary (TGNB) wellness and equity program fund act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-03SenateSIGNED CHAP.97
2023-03-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-02-27Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-02-27Assemblypassed assembly
2023-02-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.66
2023-02-01Assemblysubstituted for a1708
2023-01-30Assemblyreferred to health
2023-01-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-01-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-17SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.104
2023-01-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A01708 (Same As) 2023-02-01 - substituted by s1336

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback