NY S01332 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the tenant dignity and safe housing act relating to special proceedings for judgment directing repairs of conditions and other relief in residential real property to limit jurisdiction; provides that proceedings may be maintained against any respondent with a legal obligation to maintain the property.
Title
Amends the tenant dignity and safe housing act relating to special proceedings for judgment directing repairs of conditions and other relief in residential real property to limit jurisdiction; provides that proceedings may be maintained against any respondent with a legal obligation to maintain the property.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A983 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.100 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00983 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.36