NY S01323 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the licensing of genetic counselors; creates the state board for genetic counseling.
Title
Provides for the licensing of genetic counselors; creates the state board for genetic counseling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1924 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1323B |
2018-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1323A |
2017-06-19 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.607 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02275 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - print number 2275b