NY S01313 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the liability of a municipality or governmental subdivision for the refund of property taxes to the Long Island power authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the liability of a municipality or governmental subdivision for the refund of property taxes to the Long Island power authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-02-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-02-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.253
2021-01-11SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback