NY S01311 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Long Island Power Authority to prepare a semi-annual expenditure and lobbying report to be submitted to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly; defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Long Island Power Authority to prepare a semi-annual expenditure and lobbying report to be submitted to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly; defines terms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.252
2021-01-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 1311A
2021-01-26SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2021-01-11SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04635 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback